Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jaslow, Howard M, Lafont, Richard A., against David Weiss, Super Nunyah, Llc And, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 22, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 04, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Demand letter |
||
June 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.