Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Devin Dominquez, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fisher, John Henry, against Joseph Racanelli Md, Lisa Fisher Md, Radiological Associates, P.C., St. Luke'S Cornwall Hospital, represented by Milligram, Steven I, Regenbaum, Andrew Seth, Weir, Seamus Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Orange County Supreme Court with Catherine M Bartlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine M Bartlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseOrange County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 17, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 30, 2020ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Completed Notice as to Case Status |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) as to SLCH |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.