Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Orthopedic Associates Of Dutchess County, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Martha Arias, represented by Unrepresented And Not Participating In Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Craig S Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig S Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 13, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of service of court notification |
||
November 24, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 18, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit in support of motion |
||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Invoice |
||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings |
||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice and Authorization |
||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Compliance |
||
November 18, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.