Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tia Justino, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Luke, John Christopher, against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine M Bartlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine M Bartlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) | ||
August 06, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 - Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal |
||
May 19, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 19, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 05, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | ||
April 08, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.