Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Winograd, Ian Zev, against Joseph Rottenberg, represented by Unrepresented And Not Participating In Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | INTERROGATORIES | ||
February 17, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 22, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
January 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Joseph Rottenberg |
||
January 11, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.