Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Slobod, Hon. Elaine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSlobod, Hon. Elaine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time1161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Dismissed Elaine Slobod STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
February 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Elaine Slobod IN COURT, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
February 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Elaine Slobod STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
December 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
November 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
October 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Elaine Slobod STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
|
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Elaine Slobod Supreme Trial, STATUS, 9:15 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Slobod, Hon. Elaine |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.