Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with HON CRAIG J DORAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON CRAIG J DORAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2010 |
CategoryMedical/Podiatric Malpractice |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2010 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED DORAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
March 24, 2010 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) DORAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
March 24, 2010 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) DORAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
March 24, 2010 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD DORAN (Hearing) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
February 10, 2010 | Motion |
SUB KEVIN R HOLBROOK JR AS PLT (Motion #001) Decided: 03/24/2010SETTLED PER JACKIE Before Justice: HON CRAIG J DORAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
February 10, 2010 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) DORAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
February 10, 2010 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD DORAN (Hearing) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
January 13, 2010 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD DORAN (Hearing) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
|
January 13, 2010 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DORAN (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON CRAIG J DORAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.