Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nash Rooney Faville, Nash Rooney Mullally, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case represented by Fero, Matthew John, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Name Change |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeName Change |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 07, 2021PETITION
Date: September 07, 2021RJI -RE: 202.6(b)
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
September 29, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Granting Leve to Change Child's Name |
||
September 27, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
September 09, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
September 07, 2021 | Affidavit of Publication of Public Notice of Name Change | ||
September 07, 2021 | Petition | ||
September 07, 2021 |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Notice of Petition |
||
September 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Birth |
||
September 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Notice of Petition |
||
September 07, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.