Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Kyle M Wilt, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: December 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 30, 2021 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
December 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1407541 | ||
December 03, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1407541 |
||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407541 |
||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407541 |
||
October 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.