Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Legend Advance Funding Ii Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Muller, Richard, against Billy Dee Spencer, Spencer Renovation And Construction, Spencer Renovation And Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 20, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER - SEVERANCE
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT SALES AGREEMENT
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 20, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | ORDER - SEVERANCE | ||
January 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F ORDER OF SEVERANCE |
||
January 20, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT | ||
January 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE |
||
January 20, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT AND BILL OF COSTS |
||
January 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION WAIVING 3RD CAUSE OF ACTION | ||
January 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MERCHANT SALES AGREEMENT MERCHANT SALES AGREEMENT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D AFFIRMATION OF MAILING |
||
January 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.