Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gary Schroeder, North American Perishables Co Llc, Oakshire Naturals Gp Llc, Oakshire Naturals Lp, filed a(n) Racketeering - Torts case represented by Costigan, William F., against Anthony Lodati, Argus Capital Funding Llp, Jay Rogers, Park Avenue Recovery Llc, Royal Capital Funding Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Meyerson, Robert A., Ollunga, Samuel O., in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Jscott Odorisi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJscott Odorisi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fraud And Racketeering) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeRacketeering |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) *Corrected* March 2020 Information Subpoena Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Proposed Decision/Order denying Plaitiff's Motion to Disqualify(Seq.002) in all respects |
||
August 17, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 17, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT (Motion #003) Answering Defendants' Reuqest for Oral Arguemnt of their Motion for an Order fo Dismissal before Hon Answering Defendants' Reuqest for Oral Arguemnt of their Motion for an Order fo Dismissal before Hon ... show more |
||
August 15, 2022 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #003) Affidavit of Default-Kalamata Capital |
||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Word Cournt Certification |
||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #003) Merchant ash Advance Agreement Kalamata Capital to Oakshire |
||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #003) Exhibit 17 Proposed Judgment Kalamata Capital |
||
July 29, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003) Memorandum of Law In Reply to Opposition and in further Support of Motion for an Order of Dismissal |
||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #003) Entered Judgment on Confession of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.