Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, Citibank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Owsiany, Grzegorz, against Jeanette A Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT LAST STATMENT OF CREDIT CARD |
||
June 03, 2021 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
June 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT NON-MIL |
||
June 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL |
||
June 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
June 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
June 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT BUYER |
||
June 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.