Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Amy Gordon, Michael Levere, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Capell, Walter Richard, Griffin, Aaron Matthew, Tang, David Ming-Teh, against Guy A Murphy, Linda A Murphy, represented by Mcfadden, Langston David, Smith, Mallory Kass, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D. Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D. Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Purchase/Contract Dispute) |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of Ontario County, New York. The plaintiffs, Amy Gordon and Michael Levere, are suing the defendants, Guy A. Murphy and Linda A. Murphy, over a real property located at 5311 Meadow Creek L...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 12, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
November 14, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
October 25, 2023 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Virtual appearance information for 11.22.23 |
||
October 25, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #08) Purchase and Sales Contract. |
||
October 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #08) Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Summons and Third-Party Complaint |
||
October 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #08) Third-Party Defendants Answer with Counterclaims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.