Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joseph A Dowell, Linda Dowell, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kublick, Jan Scott, Taylor, Wyman Robert, against 4000 Medical Center Drive, Llc, Aerobiology Laboratory Associates, Inc.,, A.J.M Management Services, Inc., Dickinson Environmnetal Consulting, Llc, Est Trish Llc D B A Stanley Steemer Of Syracuse, (total of 18) See All represented by Benson, Kristen Michelle, Cahill, Julie Margaret, Gale, Catherine A., Kim, Min La, Kramer, Steven R, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Donald A Greenwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald A Greenwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1721 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1721 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2014STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #2)
Date: July 27, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Decision and Order |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS *Corrected* | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.