Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Elizabeth M. Chamorro, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 18 07 23 Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Mail Dated 05/27/2015 | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Affirmation Dated 05/05/2015 |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Non Mil Status Dated 05/05/2015 | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment Dated 05/05/2015 |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 15 02 19 AAOS |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 15 02 05 AOS |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 15 02 05 AOS |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.