Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Eric Swizdor, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time186 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2015SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A BILL OF SALE |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.