Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Apis Management Llc Dba Fairfield Funding, Tatalisha Mack, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ostrov, Robert L, against Prudential Assigned Settlement Services Corporation, Prudential Insurance Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Anthony J Paris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J Paris Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time73 days |
PETITION *Corrected*
Date: December 24, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2015RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION *Corrected* | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Prior Transfers |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) List of Dependents |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Independent Professional Advice |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Best Interests Affidavit |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Disclosures |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.