Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rbs Citizens, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Karns, Adam J, Levy, Robert S, Parikh, Pragna, Shur, Joseph M, against Lisa Brackett, represented by Brackett, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1030 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 09, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 04, 2016STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: April 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service for amended complaint |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.