Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rose Ross, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martoccia, Anthony R., Quattrocci, Robert Alan, against Dashti I. Abdullah, Pamela O'Neill, Zugaib Taxi & Dispatch Inc., represented by Cartwright, Daniel Kenneth, Hamberger, Douglas Paul, Miller, Keith Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Gerard J Neri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerard J Neri Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time666 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
May 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Neri, Hon Gerard J. |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Neri, Hon Gerard J. |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Scheduled on 5/4/20; Stip Due |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Stipulation of Discontinuance due by 1/27/20 |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter to Judge |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.