Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodney L. Mclaurin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mallaber, Randy Carl, against Gerald J. Safranko, Kamara Safranko, represented by Miller, Keith Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Rory A Mcmahon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRory A Mcmahon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Rory A. McMahon |
||
March 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Request for 30 day adjournment |
||
February 02, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Judge McMahon |
||
January 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR police report Redacted |
||
January 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Upstate ER records Redacted per 22 NYCRR Upstate ER records Redacted |
||
January 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) transcript of McLaurin |
||
January 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.