Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against John W White, John W. White Construction, In, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AOF |
||
July 26, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
July 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
July 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
July 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
July 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
January 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 27, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.