Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Raychella S Hamilton, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 01, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
November 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Search |
||
November 01, 2021 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
November 01, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
November 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract |
||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Re-Served Affidavit of Service - Raychella |
||
February 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.