Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lori A. Pallotta, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wallitt, Sara Teresa, against Deluxe Home And Office Cleaning, Llc, Suzanne A. Honsinger, represented by Ryan, Daniel R., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 09, 2021 |
ANSWER Suzanne A. Honsinger |
||
March 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 01, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 29, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.