Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Timeka S. Smart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Kenyah Ebony-Bronze Smart, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Michelle Pirro Bailey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Pirro Bailey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 17, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
August 17, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
August 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
June 08, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
June 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
April 07, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.