Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Manufacturers And Traders Trust Company As Successor In Interest By Merger To Partners Trust Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hanley, Anthony, against Carolyn E. Fallis, Cavalry Spv I Llc Aao Citibank Na, Jane Doe The Two Defendants Last Named Being Possible Tenants In Possession Of Portions Of Premises Under Foreclosure, The Names Being Fictitious, Their True Names Being Unknown To Plaintiff, John Doe, Kevin A. Fallis, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Deborah H Karalunas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah H Karalunas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: March 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Consenting to Cancellation of Notice of Pendency |
||
March 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 11, 2022 | Affidavit Canceling Notice of Pendency | ||
March 07, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT reinstatement-3-21-22 conference cancelled |
||
March 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 20, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Foreclosure Settlement Conference |
||
December 13, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 13, 2021 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Cavalry SPV I LLC aao Citibank NA |
||
November 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing Affidavit of Service by Mail on Cavalry SPV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.