Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eleanor J. Vanryn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ferro, Andrea Michele, against Scott A. Vanryn, represented by Carpenter, Karen Beth, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Danielle Fogel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle Fogel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
September 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 08, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
August 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 25, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
August 24, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
August 24, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 24, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
August 24, 2022 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
August 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.