Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Manufacturers And Traders Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hanley, Anthony, against Crouse Health Hospital Inc. D B A Crouse Hospital, Hafez Q. Qasem, Jane Doe The Two Defendants Last Named Being Possible Tenants In Possession Of Portions Of Premises Under Foreclosure, The Names Being Fictitious, Their True Names Being Unknown To Plaintiff, John Doe, State Tax Commission, (total of 6) See All represented by Evans, James F., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT (Motion #2) Completed Notice of Motion return date - 11/17/2022 on submission or oral argument upon request |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) Affirmation regarding Settlement Conference |
||
October 05, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order of Reference |
||
October 05, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
||
October 05, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Affidavit of Merit |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) Order (for leave to amend pleadings and for service by publication) |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Department of Defense Search results |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.