Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc D B A Jh Capital Group, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Susan Scalise, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Anthony J Paris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J Paris Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions357 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time378 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAVS963327 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 29, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Paris (Motion Part) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Paris (Motion Part) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Paris (Court Activity) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.