Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Kyra Fitzgerald, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions403 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time405 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: February 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 19 03 08 AOSM |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 19 03 04 NOE |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 19 01 30 AOR |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION 19 01 30 AONMS |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 19 01 30 JMT |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 18 02 28 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 01 AOS |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 17 12 26 SWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.