Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Dominic D Wortham, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions441 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time442 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 19 04 03 AOSM |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 19 04 01 NOE |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 19 03 14 AOR |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION 19 03 14 AONMS |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 19 03 14 JMT |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 18 03 22 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 03 01 AOS |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 17 12 21 SWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.