Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Ian C Prouty, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time183 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2018SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 28, 2017JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: June 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 08 23 AOSM |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 18 08 20 NOE |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 18 06 28 JMT |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 18 06 28 AOR |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION 18 06 28 AONMS |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 16 AOS |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 18 03 22 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 17 12 22 SWN |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.