Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Tyrone H. Wren, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2018SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON -CREDIT CARD |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.