Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michael J. Okoniewski, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by De Mari, Joseph Eugene, against Ally Financial, Inc., Citimortgage, Inc., Gmac Mortgage Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Donald A Greenwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald A Greenwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Rpapl Sections 1921&Amp; 1501) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: March 29, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 11, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided Greenwood (Court Activity) Judge: Greenwood, Hon. Donald A. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Greenwood (Motion Part) Judge: Greenwood, Hon. Donald A. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Greenwood (Motion Part) Judge: Greenwood, Hon. Donald A. |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Joseph Saville |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication Intelligencer | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication w Times Herald | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
December 28, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/27/2018Decided Before Justice: Greenwood, Hon. Donald A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Greenwood, Hon. Donald A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.