Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Isaiah Hunter As Administrator Of The Estate Of Delanie Elizabeth Walton, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Pomeroy, Jeffrey G., St. Louis, Justin Paul, against Dennis D Daly Md Individually And Or As An Agent, Servant And Or Employee Of, And Or D B A, Familycare Medical Group, P.C., Familycare Medical Group, P.C., Loretto Health And Rehabilitation Center, Its Agents, Servants And Or Employees,, represented by Bull, Gabrielle Louise, Patton, Charles Earl, Ringwood, Michael Paul, Laraby, Daniel Paul, Orosz, Diane E., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert E Antonacci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 14, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 26, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 01, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: January 22, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 12, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2018NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: March 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 22, 2017SUMMONS
Date: December 22, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 30, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: March 27, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 04, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 11, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 31, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 21, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 30, 2018ANSWER
Date: March 28, 2018ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 01, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Dennis D. Daly, M.D. and FamilyCare Medical Group, P.C. |
||
February 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 26, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 22, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Trial Note of Issue Due on or Before February 25, 2021. |
||
January 21, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.