Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cali, Christopher James, against Charles L Craig, Charles L. Craig D B A Charles L. Craig, P.A., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHARLES L. CRAIG -48760631 |
||
October 29, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHARLES L. CRAIG D/B/A CHARLES L. CRAIG, P.A. -48760616 |
||
September 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.