Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cali, Christopher James, against Christopher Bryant, Christopher L. Bryant D B A Christopher L. Bryant, Sole Proprietor, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
June 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHRISTOPHER L. BRYANT D/B/A CHRISTOPHER L. BRYANT, SOLE PROPRIETOR -487 Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHRISTOPHER L. BRYANT D/B/A CHRISTOPHER L. BRYANT, SOLE PROPRIETOR -487 ... show more |
||
November 04, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHRISTOPHER BRYANT -48793751 |
||
August 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.