Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kevin D Overton, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Deroberts, Jeffrey, against Megan M. Overton, represented by Balduf, Stacey A., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Danielle Fogel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle Fogel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | ORDER - APPROVING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) COMPENSATION UCS882 | ||
January 06, 2022 | SUMMONS AMENDED | ||
December 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
November 11, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
November 11, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
October 13, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
October 08, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
September 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.