Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hollander, Allan Scott, Kaufman, Brian Elliot, Rita, Michele Ribeiro, against Advanced Orthopedics And Joint Preservation P.C., Advant Orthocare Inc, All City Family Healthcare Center, Inc., Brooklyn Medical Practice, P.C., Community Medical Imaging P.C., (total of 14) See All represented by Gottlieb, David M., Landsberg, Simon Benjamin, Raheb, Jennifer, Tadchiev, Boris, Ursulova, Nadezhda, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021SUMMONS
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Certified Policy Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #1) Advanced NF-10s, EOR and mailing affidavit
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #1) 11/23/21 Letter from counsel re verification
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #1) Lenco NF-10s, EOR and mailing affidavit
Date: June 24, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 05, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Interrogatories Tadchiev
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 02, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 04, 2022INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 12, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
January 13, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 12, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
October 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 10, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Amended Discovery Responses (verified) |
||
October 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 02, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Interrogatories Tadchiev Response to Demand for Interrogatories Tadchiev Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 02, 2022 | Response to Demand for Interrogatories Samandarov | ||
August 05, 2022 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.