Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maria Pizarro, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Small, Craig Z., against Bryan Reed, Caring Transportation, Llc, City Of Syracuse, Frank Arquette, Sabrena Podolak, (total of 5) See All represented by Connors, Daniel Robert, Pires, Danielle Biasone, Rubin, Bethany Ann, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 13, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: September 13, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: October 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 07, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 14, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 29, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 12, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 12, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 12, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
January 12, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Reply to Co-Defendants Counter Statement of Facts |
||
December 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 21, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
December 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) 50-h Transcript |
||
December 12, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
December 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript |
||
December 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Podolak Affidavit |
||
December 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Reed Affidavit |
||
December 12, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.