Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Flynn, Kristine D., Sheerin, John J, against Kristen M Besig, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 17, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Kristen M Besig |
||
June 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.