Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Joseph A Chirico, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: July 20, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: July 20, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 15, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 23 10 16 AOSM |
||
September 26, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 23 07 10 NOE |
||
July 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION 2022 7 20 Affirmation of Non Military Status |
||
July 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 2022 7 20 Affidavit of Regularity |
||
July 20, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 2022 7 20 Statement for Judgment |
||
July 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT 2021 07 28 Affidavit of Additional Mailing |
||
July 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 2021 07 13 Affidavit of Service |
||
June 15, 2021 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE LETTER |
||
June 15, 2021 |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 2021 5 03 Summons With Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.