Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Loiselle, Anna L., Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Suzanne G Jutton, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 15, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Military Investigation |
||
November 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry w/Order |
||
November 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Statement for Judgment |
||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Invoice |
||
November 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 07, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 05, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Aff of Service for MSJ Additional Mailing Notice mailed to Court |
||
October 05, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.