Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cali, Christopher James, Cali, Jeremy P, against Christine S Cardozo, Christine S. Cardozo D B A Christine S. Rogers, R.T., represented by Kurtis, Glen A., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
January 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled S&C Mailing Affidavit-CHRISTINE S. CARDOZO-49308408 |
||
January 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled S&C Mailing Affidavit- CHRISTINE S. CARDOZO D/B/A CHRISTINE S. ROGERS, R.T. -49308583 |
||
January 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-CHRISTINE S. CARDOZO-49284829 |
||
January 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service- CHRISTINE S. CARDOZO D/B/A CHRISTINE S. ROGERS, R.T. -49284831 |
||
January 21, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
January 03, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
June 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.