Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cali, Christopher James, against Kyle W Marscola, Shona R Marscola, Shona R. Marscola D B A Shona R. Marscola, O.T., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 16, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service- SHONA R. MARSCOLA D/B/A SHONA R. MARSCOLA, O.T. -47924514 |
||
July 14, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
July 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-SHONA R. MARSCOLA -47924524 |
||
July 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-KYLE W. MARSCOLA-47924511 |
||
June 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.