Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arthur Nollie, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Berry, Martha Louise, Longstreet, Michael J., against Terri Depalma Pfohl, represented by Doherty, David P, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Conduct Causing Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 04, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 19, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 19, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 03, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Adjournment of Motion to Thursday, May 19, 2022 on submission or oral argument upon request |
||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit of Arthur Nollie |
||
January 31, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint |
||
January 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.