Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Owsiany, Grzegorz, against Greg D Harrington, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) re updated return date |
||
January 26, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT (Motion #1) Completed Notice of Motion return date - 02/23/2023 on submission. |
||
December 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) DMV search Redacted per 22 NYCRR DMV search Redacted |
||
December 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 28, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR summons and complaint Redacted |
||
December 28, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) card agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.