Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Van Duyn Center For Rehabilitation And Nursing, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kern, Kenneth Michael, against Susan Sweeney, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 01, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 29, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 11, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUSAN SWEENEY |
||
March 06, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION |
||
February 23, 2021 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.