Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Veronica Woodward, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 23, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
March 03, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 03, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
February 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 19, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.