Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cit Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action, Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Foll, Brett Perlman As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Stuart Perlman, Delay Dermuid Dba Color Coat Painting, Llc, Home Headquarters, Inc., John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictious And Unknown To Plaintiff The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants Occupants Persons Or Corporations If Any Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert E Antonacci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action, Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Foll
ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 15, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 01, 2022 | Notice of Entry | ||
July 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
June 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
June 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
May 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) Affirmation of Service |
||
May 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #5) Guardian Ad Litem Documents |
||
May 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) Affirmation of Regularity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.