Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Terry R. Lindsey, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pomeroy, Jeffrey G., against Jared David Rogers, Turf Tamerz, Inc., represented by O'Connor, Shannon T., Spencer, Sarah Katherine, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 27, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2018BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 05, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 27, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 26, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 27, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: 3101 Demands |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Electronic Filing | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.